California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB624 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 08/16/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 624AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 19, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Romero FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to repeal Section 425.2 of the Government Code, relating to the state rock. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 624, as amended, Romero. State rock. Existing law establishes various animals, vegetables, and minerals as emblematic of the state and provide that serpentine is the official state rock and lithologic emblem. This bill would remove serpentine as the state rock and lithologic emblem.  The bill would also make a statement of findings about serpentine and its association with an increased risk of the cancer mesothelioma.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   The Legislature finds and declares the following: (a) Serpentine was designated the official State Rock in 1965 and is found in 49 counties in California. (b) Serpentine contains the deadly mineral chrysotile asbestos, a known carcinogen, exposure to which increases the risk of the cancer mesothelioma. (c) California has the highest rate of mesothelioma deaths in the nation. (d) California should not designate a rock known to be toxic to the health of its residents as the state's official rock. (e) It is the intent of the Legislature to remove serpentine as the State Rock.   SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to remove serpentine as the State Rock and lithologic emblem.  SEC. 2. Section 425.2 of the Government Code is repealed.