|
08/31/2010
|
From committee: Amend and re-refer to Com. on RULES. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 31.) Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. (Page 6971.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6372.) Re-referred to Com. On RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RULES pursuant to Assrmbly Rule 77.2. Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 6329.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 975.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 680.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 399.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|