LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB632
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB632
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB632
Compare Versions
SB632 Amended August 31, 2010
SB632 Amended August 18, 2010
SB632 Amended April 30, 2009
SB632 Amended March 31, 2009
SB632 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB632 Amended August 31, 2010
SB632 Amended August 18, 2010
SB632 Amended April 30, 2009
SB632 Amended March 31, 2009
SB632 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare