|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment. (Enrolled measure version corrected August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2677.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 901.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 703.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|