LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB636
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB636
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB636
Compare Versions
SB636 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB636 Enrolled August 24, 2009
SB636 Amended April 30, 2009
SB636 Amended April 13, 2009
SB636 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB636 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB636 Enrolled August 24, 2009
SB636 Amended April 30, 2009
SB636 Amended April 13, 2009
SB636 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare