|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4101.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 5814.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2727.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 2655.)
|
|
|
|
01/08/2010
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|