LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB650
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB650
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB650
Compare Versions
SB650 Chaptered July 15, 2010
SB650 Enrolled June 29, 2010
SB650 Amended June 7, 2010
SB650 Amended January 20, 2010
SB650 Amended December 15, 2009
SB650 Amended May 6, 2009
SB650 Amended March 31, 2009
SB650 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB650 Chaptered July 15, 2010
SB650 Enrolled June 29, 2010
SB650 Amended June 7, 2010
SB650 Amended January 20, 2010
SB650 Amended December 15, 2009
SB650 Amended May 6, 2009
SB650 Amended March 31, 2009
SB650 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare