|
06/22/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. (Heard in Committee on June 17.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1149.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 1026.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26. (For vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 702.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21. Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|