LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB653
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB653
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB653
Compare Versions
SB653 Amended June 17, 2010
SB653 Amended June 10, 2010
SB653 Amended May 28, 2009
SB653 Amended May 6, 2009
SB653 Amended April 21, 2009
SB653 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB653 Amended June 17, 2010
SB653 Amended June 10, 2010
SB653 Amended May 28, 2009
SB653 Amended May 6, 2009
SB653 Amended April 21, 2009
SB653 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare