|
07/01/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 5909.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 5810.) Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 3211.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2672.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 9.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1110.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 875.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 805.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|