California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB660 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Amended

Bill June 24, 2010
Bill August 20, 2009
Bill July 15, 2009
Bill July 8, 2009
Bill June 23, 2009
Bill May 20, 2009
Bill April 27, 2009