07/02/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/02/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
06/29/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m. | |||
06/24/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/24/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2236.) To Senate. | |||
06/18/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/17/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 17.) | |||
05/28/2009 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 901.) To Assembly. | |||
05/11/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/07/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/06/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 809.) | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing May 6. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |