California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB673 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/02/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 673CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 14 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 2, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 2, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 14, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 24, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 7, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Cox FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to amend Section 15956 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utility districts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 673, Cox. Public utility districts. The existing Public Utility District Act authorizes the formation of public utility districts and authorizes a district to acquire, construct, own, operate, or control works for supplying its inhabitants with light, water, power, heat, transportation, telephone service, or other means of communication, or for the means for the disposition of garbage, sewage, or refuse matter. The act provides for the election of directors at large and requires that each office of director at large shall be designated as "director at large" number one, number 2, number 3, or number 4, there being as many numbers as there are directors at large to be elected. This bill would authorize the board of directors of a district to adopt an ordinance that provides that the candidates seeking election for directors at large receiving the greatest number of votes districtwide as there are directors to be elected would be elected to the board. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 15956 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 15956. (a) Candidates for directors at large shall be designated in all declarations of candidacy, nominating certificates, and on all official election ballots as candidates for a particular directorship at large, in accordance with the declarations of candidacy which the candidates have filed with the county elections official or the clerk of the district, as the case may be. Each office of director at large shall be designated as "director at large" number one, number two, number three, or number four, there being as many numbers as there are directors at large to be elected. (b) Notwithstanding subdivision (a) or any other provision of this article, the board of directors of a district may adopt an ordinance that requires that candidates for directors at large need not designate a numbered office. The ordinance shall instead require that the candidates receiving the greatest number of votes districtwide as there are directors to be elected shall be elected to the board of directors.