|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2288.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2888.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 1183.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 581.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|