LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB674
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB674
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB674
Compare Versions
SB674 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB674 Amended August 17, 2009
SB674 Amended July 23, 2009
SB674 Amended June 1, 2009
SB674 Amended May 20, 2009
SB674 Amended April 28, 2009
SB674 Amended April 2, 2009
SB674 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB674 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB674 Amended August 17, 2009
SB674 Amended July 23, 2009
SB674 Amended June 1, 2009
SB674 Amended May 20, 2009
SB674 Amended April 28, 2009
SB674 Amended April 2, 2009
SB674 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare