|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 606, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 2370.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 3110.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3036.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2757.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1108.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 809.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 588.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|