LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB676
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB676
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB676
Compare Versions
SB676 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB676 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB676 Amended September 4, 2009
SB676 Amended August 27, 2009
SB676 Amended July 14, 2009
SB676 Amended June 25, 2009
SB676 Amended May 12, 2009
SB676 Amended April 13, 2009
SB676 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB676 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB676 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB676 Amended September 4, 2009
SB676 Amended August 27, 2009
SB676 Amended July 14, 2009
SB676 Amended June 25, 2009
SB676 Amended May 12, 2009
SB676 Amended April 13, 2009
SB676 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare