|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 608, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2458.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
In Assembly. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Read third time. Amended. (Page 3402.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3402.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. Returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3336.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 922.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 849.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 706.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|