LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB678
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB678
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB678
Compare Versions
SB678 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB678 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB678 Amended September 12, 2009
SB678 Amended August 31, 2009
SB678 Amended June 25, 2009
SB678 Amended June 4, 2009
SB678 Amended April 16, 2009
SB678 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB678 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB678 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB678 Amended September 12, 2009
SB678 Amended August 31, 2009
SB678 Amended June 25, 2009
SB678 Amended June 4, 2009
SB678 Amended April 16, 2009
SB678 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare