|
11/12/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 652, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
11/12/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
11/05/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
11/03/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 2554.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
11/02/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
11/02/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3579.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 12. Page 3583.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
10/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. On W.,P. & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 3380.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on September 11.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3039.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 511.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|