LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB68
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB68
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB68
Compare Versions
SB68 Chaptered November 12, 2009
SB68 Enrolled November 4, 2009
SB68 Amended November 2, 2009
SB68 Amended September 4, 2009
SB68 Introduced January 20, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB68 Chaptered November 12, 2009
SB68 Enrolled November 4, 2009
SB68 Amended November 2, 2009
SB68 Amended September 4, 2009
SB68 Introduced January 20, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare