|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2272.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2888.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2313.) Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 545.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 496.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|