LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB680
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB680
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB680
Compare Versions
SB680 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB680 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB680 Amended September 2, 2009
SB680 Amended August 17, 2009
SB680 Amended June 24, 2009
SB680 Amended May 28, 2009
SB680 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB680 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB680 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB680 Amended September 2, 2009
SB680 Amended August 17, 2009
SB680 Amended June 24, 2009
SB680 Amended May 28, 2009
SB680 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare