08/27/2009 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
07/01/2009 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/24/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 17.) | |||
06/02/2009 | To Com. on ED. | |||
05/06/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/06/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 798.) To Assembly. | |||
04/29/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
04/28/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/27/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 609.) | |||
04/13/2009 | Set for hearing April 22. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |