California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB682 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 06/24/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 682AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 24, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Padilla (Coauthors: Senators Alquist, Florez, Romero, and Wyland) FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add  and repeal  Section 52377.5  to   of  the Education Code, relating to individuals with exceptional needs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 682, as amended, Padilla. Individuals with exceptional needs: academic and occupational training: pilot program. Existing law requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to establish the capacity to provide transition services such as employment and academic training, strategic planning, interagency coordination, and parent training for a broad range of individuals with exceptional needs, including autism spectrum disorders and other disabilities. This bill, contingent upon the availability of federal funds for this purpose, would  establish a pilot program   authorize a county office of education or consortium of county offices of education to establish pilot programs  for the purposes of providing combined academic and occupational training to secondary school pupils with autism spectrum disorders and other  special   exceptional  needs.  The bill would state the Legislature's intent that this pilot program model existing career technical education programs, as specified   The bill would require a county office of education or consortium of county offices of education that establishes a pilot program pursuant to these provisions to submit an evaluation containing specified information about the program to the State Department of Education, the Assembly Committee on Education, and the Senate Committee on Education on or before January 1, 2014. These provisions would be repealed on January 1, 2015  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 52377.5 is added to the Education Code, to read: 52377.5. To the extent that federal funds are made available  for this purpose, there is hereby established a pilot program for the purposes of providing combined academic and occupational training to secondary school pupils with autism spectrum disorders and other special needs. It is the intent of the Legislature that this pilot program model existing career technical education programs, including, but not limited to, partnership academies and regional occupational programs or centers, that may be tailored to meet the unique needs of pupils with autism spectrum disorders and other special needs.   for these purposes, a county office of education or consortium of county offices of education may establish and administer pilot programs for the purposes of providing combined academic and occupational training to secondary school pupils with autism spectrum disorders and other exceptional needs.   (a) A county office of education or consortium of county offices of education that establishes a pilot program pursuant to this section shall submit an evaluation to the department, the Assembly Committee on Education, and the Senate Committee on Education on or before January 1, 2014. The evaluation shall include at least all of the following:   (1) The number and grade levels of pupils who participated in the pilot program.   (2) A description of the program, including the type of academic and occupational training offered.   (3) A description of program outcomes, including the type of skills gained by the participating pupils, graduation rates, job placement, participation in postsecondary education, and participation in job training.   (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2015, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2015, deletes or extends that date.