California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB694 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill May 18, 2010
Bill January 12, 2010
Bill December 15, 2009
Bill May 4, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009
Bill March 31, 2009