LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB694
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB694
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB694
Compare Versions
SB694 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB694 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB694 Amended May 18, 2010
SB694 Amended January 12, 2010
SB694 Amended December 15, 2009
SB694 Amended May 4, 2009
SB694 Amended April 13, 2009
SB694 Amended March 31, 2009
SB694 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB694 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB694 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB694 Amended May 18, 2010
SB694 Amended January 12, 2010
SB694 Amended December 15, 2009
SB694 Amended May 4, 2009
SB694 Amended April 13, 2009
SB694 Amended March 31, 2009
SB694 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare