|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 505, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4892.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6498.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6428.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on March 23.)
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2735.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
From inactive file to second reading file. Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Senate Rule 43 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 1373.) Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Negrete McLeod.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 16. Page 1198.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1198.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 15. Page 901.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 581.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|