LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB700
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB700
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB700
Compare Versions
SB700 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB700 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB700 Amended August 20, 2010
SB700 Amended January 26, 2010
SB700 Amended May 20, 2009
SB700 Amended May 11, 2009
SB700 Amended April 22, 2009
SB700 Amended April 13, 2009
SB700 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB700 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB700 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB700 Amended August 20, 2010
SB700 Amended January 26, 2010
SB700 Amended May 20, 2009
SB700 Amended May 11, 2009
SB700 Amended April 22, 2009
SB700 Amended April 13, 2009
SB700 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare