|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 18. Page 2215.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 2712.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 2664.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1008.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 885.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 939.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Set for hearing May 14 in T. & H. pending suspension of rules.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 755.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|