LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB728
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB728
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB728
Compare Versions
SB728 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB728 Enrolled September 8, 2009
SB728 Amended August 20, 2009
SB728 Amended April 27, 2009
SB728 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB728 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB728 Enrolled September 8, 2009
SB728 Amended August 20, 2009
SB728 Amended April 27, 2009
SB728 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare