|
06/29/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2705.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2672.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/08/2010
|
Set for hearing January 13.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
12/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 637.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|