LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB732
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB732
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB732
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 27, 2009
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 8, 2010
Compare
Bill
January 20, 2010
Compare
Bill
January 5, 2010
Compare
Bill
December 17, 2009
Compare
Bill
March 31, 2009
Compare