|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 5. Page 2540.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1136.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 701.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|