California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB791 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/17/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 791ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 2, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 16, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 19, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 12302.27 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 791, Yee. In-home supportive services: providers: COBRA. Existing law provides for the In-Home Supportive Services (IHSS) program, under which, either through employment by the recipient or by or through contract by the county, qualified, aged, blind, and disabled persons receive services enabling them to remain in their own homes. This bill would provide that, for purposes of in-home supportive services providers, the entity that administers health benefits under the federal Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act (COBRA) shall be the same entity that implements a specified federal COBRA subsidy program for these providers. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12302.27 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 12302.27. The entity that administers the COBRA health benefit for in-home supportive services providers shall be the same entity responsible for implementing the subsidy program in Title III of Division B of the federal Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Public Law 111-5) for these providers. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to access federal funding at the earliest possible time, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.