|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 479, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 4920.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 6513.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6372.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6327.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committe August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2729.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2694.)
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 609.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|