LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB798
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB798
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB798
Compare Versions
SB798 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB798 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB798 Amended August 18, 2010
SB798 Amended August 16, 2010
SB798 Amended June 24, 2010
SB798 Amended January 11, 2010
SB798 Amended April 29, 2009
SB798 Amended April 1, 2009
SB798 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB798 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB798 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB798 Amended August 18, 2010
SB798 Amended August 16, 2010
SB798 Amended June 24, 2010
SB798 Amended January 11, 2010
SB798 Amended April 29, 2009
SB798 Amended April 1, 2009
SB798 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare