06/25/2009 | In Senate. Urgency clause refused adoption. Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1468.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Ducheny. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1468.) | |||
06/25/2009 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2253.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 3. Page 2255.) To Senate. | |||
06/15/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/11/2009 | Placed on second reading file. | |||
04/16/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/16/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 514.) To Assembly. | |||
04/01/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. | |||
01/21/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |||
01/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |