|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3340.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3038.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading. (Corrected September 3.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 896.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 809.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|