LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB813
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB813
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB813
Compare Versions
SB813 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB813 Amended September 4, 2009
SB813 Amended August 31, 2009
SB813 Amended August 17, 2009
SB813 Amended July 14, 2009
SB813 Amended July 1, 2009
SB813 Amended May 12, 2009
SB813 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB813 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB813 Amended September 4, 2009
SB813 Amended August 31, 2009
SB813 Amended August 17, 2009
SB813 Amended July 14, 2009
SB813 Amended July 1, 2009
SB813 Amended May 12, 2009
SB813 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare