|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2388.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 3209.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2826.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 923.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 639.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|