California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB816 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 31, 2009
Bill June 26, 2009
Bill April 28, 2009