|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 480, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4966.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Set for hearing August 26. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4955.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4858.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6501.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6298.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Heard in committee on May 28.)
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 931.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 682.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after April 19.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|