LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB830
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB830
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB830
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 19, 2009
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 31, 2010
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 29, 2010
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 17, 2010
Compare
Bill
August 2, 2010
Compare
Bill
March 8, 2010
Compare
Bill
September 3, 2009
Compare
Bill
July 24, 2009
Compare