|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Re-referred to Com. On RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6434.) To third reading. (August amended measure version corrected August 26.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 3736.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3669.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3297.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3184.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|