LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB837
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB837
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB837
Compare Versions
SB837 Amended August 20, 2010
SB837 Amended August 2, 2010
SB837 Amended June 22, 2010
SB837 Amended June 1, 2010
SB837 Amended May 12, 2010
SB837 Amended April 27, 2010
SB837 Amended April 15, 2010
SB837 Amended March 25, 2010
SB837 Introduced January 5, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB837 Amended August 20, 2010
SB837 Amended August 2, 2010
SB837 Amended June 22, 2010
SB837 Amended June 1, 2010
SB837 Amended May 12, 2010
SB837 Amended April 27, 2010
SB837 Amended April 15, 2010
SB837 Amended March 25, 2010
SB837 Introduced January 5, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare