|
06/03/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3582.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5237.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on May 12.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (May 6 amended version corrected May 10.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on May 4.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3194.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3144.)
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3037.)
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|