LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB838
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB838
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB838
Compare Versions
SB838 Chaptered June 3, 2010
SB838 Enrolled May 24, 2010
SB838 Amended May 6, 2010
SB838 Amended April 29, 2010
SB838 Amended April 6, 2010
SB838 Amended February 16, 2010
SB838 Introduced January 5, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB838 Chaptered June 3, 2010
SB838 Enrolled May 24, 2010
SB838 Amended May 6, 2010
SB838 Amended April 29, 2010
SB838 Amended April 6, 2010
SB838 Amended February 16, 2010
SB838 Introduced January 5, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare