|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4878.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6258.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 5. Page 3266.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|