LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB849
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB849
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB849
Compare Versions
SB849 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB849 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB849 Amended August 9, 2010
SB849 Amended June 22, 2010
SB849 Introduced January 11, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB849 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB849 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB849 Amended August 9, 2010
SB849 Amended June 22, 2010
SB849 Introduced January 11, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare